NJ A2218 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S582 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S582 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates New Jersey Big Data Alliance as State's advanced cyberinfrastructure consortium.
Title
Designates New Jersey Big Data Alliance as State's advanced cyberinfrastructure consortium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S582 (2R) |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Diegnan) |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Same As) 2014-08-15 - Approved P.L.2014, c.33.