NJ S582 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Approved P.L.2014, c.33.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Approved P.L.2014, c.33.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates New Jersey Big Data Alliance as State's advanced cyberinfrastructure consortium.*
Title
Designates New Jersey Big Data Alliance as State's advanced cyberinfrastructure consortium.*
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2218 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2218 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2218 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2218 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.33. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2218 (2R) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chivukula) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2218 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S582 (2R)