NJ A2221 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.158.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.158.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows gross income taxpayers to use returns to make voluntary contributions to the Boy Scouts of America Councils in New Jersey.
Title
Allows gross income taxpayers to use returns to make voluntary contributions to the Boy Scouts of America Councils in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2453 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.158. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2453 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2453 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A2221