NJ A2372 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4019
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Red Mascara Act;" designates five State songs.*
Title
"Red Mascara Act;" designates five State songs.*
Sponsors
Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0) |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DiMaio) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S373 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4019 (Carry Over) 2014-12-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4019 (Carry Over) 2014-12-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee