NJ A2404 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires residential community release programs to file certain financial disclosure documents with DOC.
Title
Requires residential community release programs to file certain financial disclosure documents with DOC.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |