NJ A242 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that persons may execute legal signatures through handwriting, electronic signing, or use of fingerprint, thumbprint, or other identifying mark.
Title
Clarifies that persons may execute legal signatures through handwriting, electronic signing, or use of fingerprint, thumbprint, or other identifying mark.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A124 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee