NJ A2444 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A403
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for coverage of comprehensive tobacco cessation benefits in Medicaid.
Title
Provides for coverage of comprehensive tobacco cessation benefits in Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2081 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.473. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2081 (2R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A403 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2081 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A2444/2656 (ACS/1R)
S2081 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A2444/2656 (ACS/1R)