NJ S2081 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A2444/2656 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A2444/2656 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for coverage of comprehensive tobacco cessation benefits in Medicaid.
Title
Provides for coverage of comprehensive tobacco cessation benefits in Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2444/2656 (ACS/1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2444 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.473.
A403 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A403 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee