NJ A2450 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1460
Note: Carry Over of previous A1004
Note: Carry Over of previous A1004
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes notification standards for certain service contracts with automatic renewal.*
Title
Establishes notification standards for certain service contracts with automatic renewal.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-4-0) |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2450 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1004 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1837 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1004 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1837 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading