NJ A2505 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns compensation and benefits of officers, employees, and members of State and local authorities. *
Title
Concerns compensation and benefits of officers, employees, and members of State and local authorities. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-02-17 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Substituted for S2044 (1R) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-15 | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-11-08 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee | |
2010-06-28 | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) | |
2010-05-20 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2044 (Same As) 2011-02-17 - Substituted by A2505 (3R)