NJ S2044 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Substituted by A2505 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Substituted by A2505 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns compensation and benefits of officers, employees, and members of State and local authorities.
Title
Concerns compensation and benefits of officers, employees, and members of State and local authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Substituted by A2505 (3R) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-11-08 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2505 (Same As) 2011-02-17 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2044 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2500/2044_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2500/2044_R1.HTM |