NJ A2547 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates four State songs.
Title
Designates four State songs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2012-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1865 (Same As) 2012-05-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4154 (Same As) 2013-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
A4154 (Same As) 2013-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A2547 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3000/2547_I1.HTM |