NJ A2649 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4276
Note: Carry Over of previous A3064
Note: Carry Over of previous S938
Note: Carry Over of previous A3064
Note: Carry Over of previous S938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires nursing homes to provide training to staff in behavioral health issues.
Title
Requires nursing homes to provide training to staff in behavioral health issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2649 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S892 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3064 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S938 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S892 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3064 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S938 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading