NJ S892 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3064
Note: Carry Over of previous S938
Note: Carry Over of previous S938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires nursing homes to provide training to staff in behavioral health issues.
Title
Requires nursing homes to provide training to staff in behavioral health issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3064 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A2649 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S938 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2649 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S938 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S892 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/892_I1.HTM |