NJ A2658 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Common Interest Community Manager Licensing Act."
Title
"Common Interest Community Manager Licensing Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. David Rible [R] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2578 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2578 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-11-0) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-7) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S2578 (1R) |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-26-1) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2578 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A2658 (2R)