NJ S2578 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A2658 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A2658 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Common Interest Community Manager Licensing Act."
Title
"Common Interest Community Manager Licensing Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by A2658 (2R) |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2658 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2578 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2578_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2578_R1.HTM |