NJ A275 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4652
Note: Carry Over of previous S3198
Note: Carry Over of previous S3198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows persons owing certain court-imposed financial obligations and ordered by court to serve term of probation or diversionary program to earn transformative credit against amount owed by participating in treatment programs, educational or vocational services, or service to community.
Title
Allows persons owing certain court-imposed financial obligations and ordered by court to serve term of probation or diversionary program to earn transformative credit against amount owed by participating in treatment programs, educational or vocational services, or service to community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4652 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1112 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3198 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1112 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3198 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A275 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/275_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A275 |