NJ S1112 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1197
Note: Carry Over of previous S3198
Note: Carry Over of previous A4652
Note: Carry Over of previous S3198
Note: Carry Over of previous A4652
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows drug- or alcohol-dependent person admitted into court-ordered supervisory treatment program to reduce amount owed on court-ordered fines and certain other financial obligations upon successful completion of program.
Title
Allows drug- or alcohol-dependent person admitted into court-ordered supervisory treatment program to reduce amount owed on court-ordered fines and certain other financial obligations upon successful completion of program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1112 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A275 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3198 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4652 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A275 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3198 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4652 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1112 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1112_I1.HTM |