NJ A2853 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Approved P.L.2011, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Approved P.L.2011, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Streamlines process for State and local agency business permits related to economic development projects.
Title
Streamlines process for State and local agency business permits related to economic development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Approved P.L.2011, c.34. | |
2011-01-10 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-3) | |
2011-01-10 | Substituted for S6/1914 (SCS) | |
2011-01-10 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Assembly (75-2-0) | |
2010-12-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2010-06-10 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1914 (Same As) 2010-12-20 - Combined with S6 (SCS)