NJ S1914 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Combined with S6 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Combined with S6 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Streamlines process for State and local agency business permits related to economic development projects.
Title
Streamlines process for State and local agency business permits related to economic development projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-20 | Combined with S6 (SCS) | |
2010-12-13 | Motion To Table (Buono) (21-17) | |
2010-12-13 | Motion To Relieve from SBA (Kyrillos) | |
2010-12-06 | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2853 (Same As) 2011-03-01 - Approved P.L.2011, c.34.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1914 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1914_I1.HTM |