NJ A2922 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "Administrative Procedure Act" concerning conflicts between rules of different State agencies.
Title
Revises "Administrative Procedure Act" concerning conflicts between rules of different State agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Barnes [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Gary Chiusano [R] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Alison McHose [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-12-15 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-1) | |
2010-06-17 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-14 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2607 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee