NJ A2993 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3460
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.161.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.161.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid coverage for diabetes self-management education, training, services, and equipment for patients diagnosed with diabetes, gestational diabetes, and pre-diabetes.
Title
Requires Medicaid coverage for diabetes self-management education, training, services, and equipment for patients diagnosed with diabetes, gestational diabetes, and pre-diabetes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1305 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1305 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.161. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-3-3) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted for S1305 (2R) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Vitale) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-4-2) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1305 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A2993 (2R)
A3460 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3460 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session