NJ A3205 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Substituted by S1643 (SCS/4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Substituted by S1643 (SCS/4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sterilization of all cats and dogs released for adoption from various facilities; updates law concerning impoundment. *
Title
Requires sterilization of all cats and dogs released for adoption from various facilities; updates law concerning impoundment. *
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Substituted by S1643 (SCS/4R) | |
2011-03-03 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Burzichelli) | |
2011-02-17 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Burzichelli) | |
2011-02-10 | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-16 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1643 (Same As) 2011-05-12 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3205 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3205_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3205_R1a.HTM |