NJ A3273 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2201 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2201 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes youth camps to maintain supply of epinephrine and permit trained employees to administer epinephrine to camp members suffering from anaphylaxis.
Title
Authorizes youth camps to maintain supply of epinephrine and permit trained employees to administer epinephrine to camp members suffering from anaphylaxis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S2201 (2R) |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2201 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.231.