NJ A3389 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-06 - Substituted by S2370 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-06 - Substituted by S2370 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises financial assistance under Business Retention and Relocation Assistance Grant Program; repeals requirement to study implementation.
Title
Revises financial assistance under Business Retention and Relocation Assistance Grant Program; repeals requirement to study implementation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-06 | Substituted by S2370 (2R) | |
2010-12-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2010-11-08 | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2010-10-14 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2370 (Same As) 2011-01-06 - Approved P.L.2010, c.123.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3389 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3389_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3389_R1.HTM |