NJ S2370 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on January 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-06 - Approved P.L.2010, c.123.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on January 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-06 - Approved P.L.2010, c.123.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises financial assistance under Business Retention and Relocation Assistance Grant Program; repeals requirement to study implementation.
Title
Revises financial assistance under Business Retention and Relocation Assistance Grant Program; repeals requirement to study implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-06 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-06 | Approved P.L.2010, c.123. | |
2011-01-06 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) | |
2011-01-06 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-01-06 | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) | |
2011-01-06 | Substituted for A3389 (2R) | |
2010-12-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2010-11-22 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2010-11-22 | Passed by the Senate (35-0) | |
2010-11-15 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-10-18 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3389 (Same As) 2011-01-06 - Substituted by S2370 (2R)