NJ A3418 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-06 - Substituted by S2373 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-06 - Substituted by S2373 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows corporation business tax credit and gross income tax credit for certain wages paid to qualified interns in tax years 2012 and 2013.
Title
Allows corporation business tax credit and gross income tax credit for certain wages paid to qualified interns in tax years 2012 and 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-06 | Substituted by S2373 (1R) | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2010-10-18 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2373 (Same As) 2011-02-22 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3418 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3418_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3418_R1.HTM |