NJ S2373 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows corporation business tax credit and gross income tax credit for certain wages paid to qualified interns in tax years 2012 and 2013.
Title
Allows corporation business tax credit and gross income tax credit for certain wages paid to qualified interns in tax years 2012 and 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate | |
2011-01-06 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-23-6) | |
2011-01-06 | Substituted for A3418 (1R) | |
2011-01-06 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-06 | Passed by the Senate (33-7) | |
2010-12-20 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-11-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3418 (Same As) 2011-01-06 - Substituted by S2373 (1R)