NJ A3432 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on August 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-07 - Approved P.L.2013, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on August 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-07 - Approved P.L.2013, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires development of a diabetes action plan by DOH.
Title
Requires development of a diabetes action plan by DOH.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2288 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2288 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.104. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-1) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2288 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2288 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A3432