NJ A3622 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to pledge to ensure availability of job training or similar activities to certain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients to prevent loss of benefits.
Title
Requires State to pledge to ensure availability of job training or similar activities to certain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients to prevent loss of benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-21-3) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1855 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading