NJ A3694 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants immunity from liability for certain professional services rendered during emergencies under certain circumstances.
Title
Grants immunity from liability for certain professional services rendered during emergencies under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3131 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3131 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Weinberg) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3131 |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3131 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3694 (1R)