NJ A3749 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows "100 percent Disabled Veterans" to receive parking privileges reserved for persons with disability.
Title
Allows "100 percent Disabled Veterans" to receive parking privileges reserved for persons with disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2114 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.166. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2114 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2114 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A3749