NJ S2114 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A3749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A3749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows "100 percent Disabled Veterans" to receive parking privileges reserved for persons with disability.
Title
Allows "100 percent Disabled Veterans" to receive parking privileges reserved for persons with disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted by A3749 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3749 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.166.