NJ A3819 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Approved P.L.2011, c.81.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Approved P.L.2011, c.81.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies employer UI tax rates.
Title
Modifies employer UI tax rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Approved P.L.2011, c.81. | |
2011-06-09 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2011-06-09 | Substituted for S2730 (1R) | |
2011-06-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-05-12 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-12 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) | |
2011-05-05 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2730 (Same As) 2011-06-09 - Substituted by A3819 (1R)