NJ S2730 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Substituted by A3819 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Substituted by A3819 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies employer UI tax rates.
Title
Modifies employer UI tax rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Substituted by A3819 (1R) | |
2011-06-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-05-12 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3819 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Approved P.L.2011, c.81.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2730 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2730_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2730_R1.HTM |