NJ A393 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1296
Note: Carry Foward to future S2214
Note: Carry Over of previous A1187
Note: Carry Foward to future S2214
Note: Carry Over of previous A1187
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State department, agency, authority, or instrumentality thereof to provide link on its website for members of public to submit complaints.
Title
Requires State department, agency, authority, or instrumentality thereof to provide link on its website for members of public to submit complaints.
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A393 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A393 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1187 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2126 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A393 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1187 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2126 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A393 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/393_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A393 |