NJ S2214 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2659
Note: Carry Foward to future S2405
Note: Carry Over of previous S2126
Note: Carry Over of previous A393
Note: Carry Foward to future S2405
Note: Carry Over of previous S2126
Note: Carry Over of previous A393
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State department, agency, authority, or instrumentality thereof to provide link on its website for members of public to submit complaints.
Title
Requires State department, agency, authority, or instrumentality thereof to provide link on its website for members of public to submit complaints.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2214 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2214 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1296 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2126 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A393 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2214 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1296 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2126 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A393 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2214 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2214_I1.HTM |