NJ A4025 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A314
Note: Carry Foward to future S2686
Note: Carry Over of previous A2728
Note: Carry Over of previous S1025
Note: Carry Foward to future S2686
Note: Carry Over of previous A2728
Note: Carry Over of previous S1025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes military compensation of military personnel serving outside of this State from gross income tax.
Title
Excludes military compensation of military personnel serving outside of this State from gross income tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4025 (Carry Over) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4025 (Carry Over) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2728 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3537 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1025 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
A4025 (Carry Over) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2728 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3537 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1025 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A4025 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4500/4025_I1.HTM |