NJ S1025 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4025
Note: Carry Foward to future S3537
Note: Carry Over of previous S1096
Note: Carry Foward to future S3537
Note: Carry Over of previous S1096
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes military compensation of military personnel serving outside of this State from gross income tax.
Title
Excludes military compensation of military personnel serving outside of this State from gross income tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Combined with S129 (SCS) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1025 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
S1025 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
S1096 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2728 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1025 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Combined with S129 (SCS)
S1096 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2728 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee