NJ A4036 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Approved P.L.2013, c.74.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Approved P.L.2013, c.74.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes directed bait and human food fishery for menhaden, and clarifies existing law regarding taking of menhaden.
Title
Establishes directed bait and human food fishery for menhaden, and clarifies existing law regarding taking of menhaden.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Sen. Joseph Kyrillos [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2726 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2726 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.74. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-0) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S2726 (1R) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-5) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (70-0-5) (Albano) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Albano) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2726 (Same As) 2013-06-03 - Substituted by A4036 (2R)