NJ A4179 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2476 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2476 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Thriving By Three competitive grant program for infant and toddler child care programs; appropriates $28 million.
Title
Establishes Thriving By Three competitive grant program for infant and toddler child care programs; appropriates $28 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2476 (2R) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2476 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.25.