NJ A4189 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2851
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends duration of first five designated UEZs for two additional years; specifies permissible use of UEZ funds; requires DCA Commissioner to assess and issue report on UEZ program.
Title
Extends duration of first five designated UEZs for two additional years; specifies permissible use of UEZ funds; requires DCA Commissioner to assess and issue report on UEZ program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2670 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-23-0) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-12) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2670 (2R) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-15-0) |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4189 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2670 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A4189 (3R)
S2670 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A4189 (3R)