NJ A4359 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Revised Uniform Limited Liability Company Act."
Title
"Revised Uniform Limited Liability Company Act."
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Alison McHose [R] | Rep. Scott Rumana [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Assembly (70-1-0) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-21 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2944 (Same As) 2011-06-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee