NJ A441 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4643
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes solar power incentive program.
Title
Establishes solar power incentive program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4643 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2691 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2691 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee