NJ A4560 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts reference to population for library director position in unclassified civil service.
Title
Adjusts reference to population for library director position in unclassified civil service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2915 |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2915 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.65.