NJ A4705 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.92.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.92.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Food Waste Task Force to make recommendations concerning food waste in New Jersey.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Food Waste Task Force to make recommendations concerning food waste in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3232 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3232 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.92. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3232 (1R) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3232 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4705 (3R)