NJ A4717 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1580
Note: Carry Over of previous A3112
Note: Carry Over of previous A3112
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows military member to qualify for resident tuition rate at county college.
Title
Allows military member to qualify for resident tuition rate at county college.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S577 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1580 (Carry Over) 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3112 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1580 (Carry Over) 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3112 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4717 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A5000/4717_I1.HTM |