NJ A5085 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A5322
Note: Carry Foward to future S3433
Note: Carry Foward to future S1750
Note: Carry Foward to future A3596
Note: Carry Foward to future S3433
Note: Carry Foward to future S1750
Note: Carry Foward to future A3596
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for process to vacate and expunge certain arrests, charges, complaints, convictions, other dispositions, and DNA records, associated with violations by certain human trafficking victims.*
Title
Provides for process to vacate and expunge certain arrests, charges, complaints, convictions, other dispositions, and DNA records, associated with violations by certain human trafficking victims.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
S3678 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
S3678 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee