NJ S3433 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5085
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5322 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5322 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for process to vacate and expunge certain arrests, charges, complaints, convictions, other dispositions, and DNA records, associated with violations by certain human trafficking victims.
Title
Provides for process to vacate and expunge certain arrests, charges, complaints, convictions, other dispositions, and DNA records, associated with violations by certain human trafficking victims.
Sponsors
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A5322 (2R) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5322 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.467.
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
A5085 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)