NJ A5462 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3267
Note: Carry Foward to future S2455
Note: Carry Over of previous S2668
Note: Carry Over of previous A3801
Note: Carry Foward to future S2455
Note: Carry Over of previous S2668
Note: Carry Over of previous A3801
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $10.5 million supplemental appropriation for increased Per Capita Library Aid.
Title
Makes $10.5 million supplemental appropriation for increased Per Capita Library Aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5462 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5462 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2668 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3587 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3801 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5462 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2668 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3587 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3801 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A5462 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A9999/5462_I1.HTM |